Financial history HARTLEPOOL PEOPLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1062163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £77.05k £115.38k £70.45k £63.79k £71.09k
Total expenditure £97.81k £104.66k £74.64k £95.55k £80.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.92k £17.97k N/A N/A