Accounts and annual returns THE BIRMINGHAM SCHOOL OF SPEECH AND DRAMA TRAINING TRUST

Charity Number: 1064706
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required