Financial history OLD KING'S CLUB BENEVOLENT FUND ICW KING'S COLLEGE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 310025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.42k £5.12k £5.74k £5.49k £6.53k
Total expenditure £2.54k £2.33k £3.05k £19.99k £2.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A