Accounts and annual returns URBAN PRESENCE

Charity number: 1069404
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 August 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 August 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required