Trustees BIDDULPH MOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1080267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Cooper Trustee 05 February 2025
MOOR FIRST PTFA
Recently registered
David Jukes Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
ANTHONY DYCHE CHAIR Trustee 10 March 2023
None on record
ROBERT ANDREW SIMS treasurer Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
JULIE JONES Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
JENNIFER ANN DULSON VICE CHAIR Trustee 08 November 2019
None on record
NIGEL WILLIAM LEWIS Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
MRS JACKIE NEVILL Trustee
None on record
GRAHAM EARDLEY Trustee
None on record