Financial history CASTLE VALE COMMUNITY FUND

Charity Number: 1061324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.00k £4.80k £5.58k £5.97k £5.40k
Total expenditure £46.80k £4.78k £5.34k £5.98k £5.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A