Accounts and annual returns SOUTHPORT BLIND AID SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1062684
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 01 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 04 August 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 10 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 13 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 25 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 01 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 23 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 08 August 2007 On Time