Financial history CUMBRIA RURAL HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1064136
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £136.73k £155.55k £131.57k £114.20k £114.31k
Total expenditure £141.03k £128.02k £124.20k £125.99k £66.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0