Financial history THE MACHYNLLETH AND DISTRICT CARE CENTRE TRUST

Charity Number: 1061445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £41.60k £46.41k £35.63k £40.24k £37.72k
Total expenditure £50.49k £37.24k £35.41k £47.07k £44.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A