Financial history FRIENDLY LODGE CHARITY OF GLADYS ELIZABETH WILD

Charity number: 1067770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024 31/12/2024
Total gross income £476 £476 £622 £225 £1.07k
Total expenditure £0 £400 £400 £0 £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A