Accounts and annual returns MARLESFORD OLD SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 310457
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 12 June 2008 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required