Financial history THE DARLINGTON ROTARY CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1062358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.29k £29.79k £28.39k £31.58k £43.48k
Total expenditure £25.97k £21.22k £25.60k £28.79k £44.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.34k N/A N/A N/A £1.20k