Accounts and annual returns ANCASTER C.E PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.F.A

Charity Number: 1075993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 March 2025 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 March 2025 616 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 August 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 August 2021 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required