Governing document THE WORLD FEDERATION OF ROSE SOCIETIES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JUNE 1997 AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2006, 14 JUNE 2007 AND 21 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/2015 as amended on 15 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCE OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN HORTICULTURE AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE CONSERVATION, CULTIVATION AND CLASSIFICATION OF THE ROSE (AND ITS CULTIVATORS) AND (2) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO ALL MATTERS CONCERNING THE ROSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.