Financial history CATALYST DANCE AND DRAMA GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 1068556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.94k £46.82k £43.32k £29.15k £15.60k
Total expenditure £32.69k £32.68k £35.45k £38.24k £40.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £350 £19.10k N/A N/A N/A