Accounts and annual returns BALBY CARR SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1061501
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 04 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 13 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 23 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | 24 November 2010 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window