Trustees RYEDALE U3A
Charity number: 1062214

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda McCarthy | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Gilham | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Cook | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Emslie | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pat Davis | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Windsor | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Harry Holmes | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Myers | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Metcalfe | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judi Watkinson | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.