Governing document SOUTH WEST BIRMINGHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27/2/1997,15/7/1997, 16/9/1997, 6/11/2003, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 17/2/2004 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1/12/2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE INHABITANTS OF BIRMINGHAM TO ENABLE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE TO BE IMPROVED. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BIRMINGHAM WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE A NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND IN PARTICULAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES DIRECTED TO THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE SUFFERING THROUGH UNEMPLOYMENT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FOR THESE PURPOSES ( BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROVIDE ADVICE, ASSISTANCE OR CONSULTANCY SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS, OTHER CHARITIES AND COMMUNITIES IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.