Accounts and annual returns MRS DOROTHY M HILES BEQUEST FUND, (IN CONNECTION WITH KINGSWODE HOE SPECIAL SCHOOL )

Charity number: 310676
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 01 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 03 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required