Accounts and annual returns DICKLEBURGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 311139
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2004 23 November 2005 291 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required