Trustees RICHARD BUNTING'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 311175

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Laura Gallop | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Steele | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Byard | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Caroline Furnell | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Patricia Ayres | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Henderson | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr DIANA BLACK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.