Financial history Friends of Hethersett VC Primary School

Charity number: 311241
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.41k £2.82k £1.69k £10.72k £12.68k
Total expenditure £8.15k £3.09k £623 £7.94k £13.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A