Financial history THE MULLER HOMES FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 311535
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2005 28/02/2006 28/02/2007 29/02/2008 28/02/2009
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A