Accounts and annual returns JOHN ELBRIDGE FOUNDATION (THE EXHIBITION FUND)

Charity number: 311612
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 13 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 13 August 2007 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not submitted