Accounts and annual returns JEWISH SECONDARY SCHOOLS MOVEMENT

Charity number: 313109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 March 2025 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 March 2025 254 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 April 2023 291 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 17 April 2023 291 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window