Accounts and annual returns THE BAR ASSOCIATION EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 313452
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 10 December 2008 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 August 2008 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted