Accounts and annual returns THE NOVARTIS FOUNDATION FOR THE PROMOTION OF INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION IN MEDICAL AND CHEMICAL RESEARCH

Charity number: 313574
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 03 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 22 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 04 March 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 22 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 23 March 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 20 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 11 April 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 30 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 22 August 2005 On Time