Trustees SUPPORT AND TRAINING IN PREP, PRIMARY AND SENIOR SCHOOLS LIMITED
Charity Number: 313688

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mark Kendall | Chair | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Morris | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Wheeler MBE | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grant Whitaker | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Templeman | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Mono | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Christopher Anthony Barnes | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Charles Baker | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Joan Marshall | Trustee | 07 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.