Accounts and annual returns THE SPECTACLE MAKERS' COMPANY'S EDUCATION AND EXAMINATION FUND
Charity number: 313784
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 18 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 04 February 2009 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 02 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 17 June 2008 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 30 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 04 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 08 February 2007 | 3 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window