Accounts and annual returns THE LABAN CENTRE FOR MOVEMENT AND DANCE ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 314071
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 30 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 30 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 25 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 25 June 2015 On Time