Accounts and annual returns JOHN WILKINS PRIZE IN CONNECTION WITH RUTHERFORD APPLETON LABORATORY

Charity number: 314228
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 18 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 18 March 2013 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 18 November 2011 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 19 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required