Accounts and annual returns The Jozef Pilsudski Institute of Research Ltd. Museum/Archives/Library

Charity number: 314270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 December 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 December 2023 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late Download Open in new window