Charity overview GEORGE KNOWLES' ENDOWMENT

Charity number: 529569-1
Removed charity
Governing document
CODICIL TO WILL PROVED 13TH AUGUST 1856.
Charitable objects
AUGMENTING THE INCOME OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL DISTRICT OF SHAROW
Registration history
  • 10 September 1965: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 12 October 2015: Re-registered
  • 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of