Charity overview CATHERINE MASON'S ENDOWMENT

Charity number: 529569-2
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED 20TH JULY 1860.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL DISTRICT OF SHAROW
Registration history
  • 10 September 1965: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 12 October 2015: Re-registered
  • 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of