Accounts and annual returns THE MARK AND MARY COHEN CHARITY

Charity number: 326235
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2011 18 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 13 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 03 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required