Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTE FOR COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE

Charity number: 326258
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2008 26 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 26 February 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 09 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 08 February 2007 8 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 09 February 2006 9 days late