Governing document RAYNAUD'S AND SCLERODERMA ASSOCIATION TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/01/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE (I) TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM RAYNAUD'S AND SCLERODERMA (SYSTEMIC SCLEROSIS), INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN NEED; (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS IN ALL ASPECTS OF RAYNAUD'S AND SCLERODERMA, INCLUDING THE PROVISION AND PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL LITERATURE ON THESE DISORDERS; AND (III) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE, TREATMENT, CARE AND PREVENTION OF BOTH RAYNAUD'S AND SCLERODERMA AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.