Accounts and annual returns THE BETHANY TRUST

Charity number: 326319
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 25 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 06 March 2014 34 days late
Annual return 31 March 2012 16 February 2013 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required