Financial history THE MAGGA BHAVAKA TRUST

Charity number: 326695
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £230.05k £233.92k £9.72k £8.44k £2.78k
Total expenditure £108.22k £97.11k £1.02m £8.82k £4.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A