Accounts and annual returns CHILD RESCUE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 327187
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 20 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 18 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 31 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 09 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 18 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required