Accounts and annual returns THE FELICITAS TRUST

Charity number: 327321
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2011 09 March 2012 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 17 February 2011 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 04 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required