Accounts and annual returns POLAR EXPLORATION GROUP

Charity number: 327359
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 17 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 10 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 13 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required