Charity overview ST CATHERINES HOSPITAL FUND
Charity number: 1050046-3
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 04/06 1997, 25/4/2002 AND 31/10/2007
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE, WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR ST CATHERINES HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 11 October 1996: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.