Financial history COOPER GAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 327514
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009
Total gross income £8.25k £233.09k £78.20k £8.72k £109.93k
Total expenditure £93.83k £193.50k £105.58k £41.30k £63.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A