Financial history THE JOHN COWAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 327613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £28.59k £26.88k £25.64k £23.56k £23.58k
Total expenditure £35.43k £33.21k £31.22k £32.79k £30.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A