Financial history HAGGAI ADVANCED LEADERSHIP TRAINING LIMITED

Charity number: 327623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £116.40k £92.10k £115.01k £71.74k £71.55k
Total expenditure £116.38k £92.24k £114.98k £85.68k £72.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A