Financial history HELP INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 327645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.33k £14.31k £44.03k £36.81k £51.26k
Total expenditure £12.97k £9.50k £45.27k £41.57k £51.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A