Financial history UNISON EASTERN REGION THIRD WORLD DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity Number: 327680
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £3.54k £3.27k £3.91k £1.69k £2.17k
Total expenditure £12.00k £0 £5.00k £9.00k £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A