Financial history THE DOCTOR EDWARD BACH MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 327719
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/01/2004 12/01/2005 12/01/2006 12/01/2007 12/01/2008
Total gross income £2.23k £2.14k £4.18k £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.56k £3.95k £4.46k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A