Financial history THE POWERLINE TRUST

Charity Number: 327801
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £56.21k £64.55k £46.82k £40.55k £46.95k
Total expenditure £56.52k £49.39k £40.95k £36.53k £59.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A